Garnett v. Care.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gwenice Garnett
Defendant: Care.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00736
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/28/2018 ORDERING this action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety, with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a); each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/11/17: The deadline to complete the VDRP session shall be extended to February 1, 2018.(Kaminski, H)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/13/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/6/17: Case Referred to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program.(Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garnett v. Care.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwenice Garnett
Represented By: James Alan Clark
Represented By: Renee Nicole Parras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care.com, Inc.
Represented By: Mollie Burks-Thomas
Represented By: Kara Keister
Represented By: Mark Posard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?