Duckswert v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dawn Rachell Duckswert
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00779
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/15/2019 GRANTING 36 Motion for Attorney Fees. Counsel for plaintiff is AWARDED $26,360.00 in attorney's fees. The Commissioner shall certify that amount to be paid to counsel from the funds previously withheld for the payment of such fees. Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED to remit to plaintiff the amount of $7,200.00 for EAJA fees previously paid to counsel by the Commissioner. (Huang, H)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/22/2019 ORDERING that fees and expenses in the amount of $7,200.00 are awarded. (Zignago, K.)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2018 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall correct the docket to reflect the correct spelling of plaintiff's last name (Zuckswert); Plaintiff's 20 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; the Commissioner's 24 motion to remand is DENIED; this matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for an immediate award of benefits; and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/3/18 ORDERING that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be EXTENDED from 4/4/18 to 5/4/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/07/18 DISCHARGING the 19 Order to Show Cause in its entirety. (Benson, A.)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/20/2018 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why his failure to file a motion for summary judgment should not be deemed a waiver of the right to file such a motion at any time, and why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Zignago, K.)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2018 ORDERING the date for Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 2/11/2018. (Washington, S)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/11/17: Plaintiff is GRANTED forty-five (45) days extension of time to file motion for summary judgment. (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/13/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2 ), is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duckswert v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Rachell Duckswert
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?