Kadhum v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anaam Kadhum
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00815
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/1/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), in the amount of $5,250.00.(Washington, S)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/1/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING the Commissioner's 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/17, ORDERING that defendant has until 11/29/2017 to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/10/17 ORDERING that Defendant has until 11/15/2017, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/19/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP 2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within 14 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. (cc: USM). (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kadhum v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anaam Kadhum
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?