Valentine v. Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District
Plaintiff: Tracey Valentine
Defendant: Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District
Case Number: 2:2017cv00827
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/15/19 GRANTING 70 joint motion for approval of settlement agreement; GRANTING 59 parties' stipulation to allow Daniel Weld to be included as an individualplaintiff; and GRANTING 69 Stipulation to dismiss plaintiffs listed. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/16/2018 ORDERING that the 8/16/2018 deadline for a final disposition is VACATED; the deadline for the parties to file a Stipulation and Request for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of this case is 9/28/2018. (Reader, L)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/12/2018 APPROVING 65 Stipulation and VACATING the 7/16/2018 deadline. The deadline for the Parties to file a Stipulation and Request for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of this case is 8/16/2018. (York, M)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/14/2018 VACATING the 5/16/2018 deadline for final disposition. The deadline for the Parties to file a Stipulation and Request for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of this case is 7/16/2018. (York, M)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/26/2017 ORDERING that a phone conference is set for 11/1/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Zignago, K.)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ON CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE TO POTENTIAL COLLECTIVE ACTION MEMBERS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/17. The hearing scheduled for 10/20/17 is VACATED. Plaintiff Tracey Valentine is appointed collective action representative. Plaintiff's counsel, Mastagni Holstedt, APC, is appointed counsel for this collective action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/17 ORDERING the Settlement Conference is RESET for 11/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Becknal, R)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/24/17 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference scheduled for 8/17/17 is CONTINUED to 12/7/2017. The deadline to submit settlement statements and file notices of submission is re-set to seven calendar days prior to the new settlement conference date. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Valentine
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Ace Thomas Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District
Represented By: Lisa S. Charbonneau
Represented By: Morin Isaac Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?