Iredia-Ortega v. Baker Residential Academic Program University of Cal et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Iredia-Ortega
Defendant: Baker Residential Academic Program University of Cal, American Bank Ins. Co. Flordia and Progress House
Case Number: 2:2017cv00843
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/23/2017 ADOPTING IN FULL 7 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Michel, G.)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/31/17 ORDERING that 8 plaintiff's Motion to Amend Judgment is DENIED as moot; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/8/17 ORDERING that Plaintiffs amended complaint is DISMISSED; and Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice; and failure to file an amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Becknal, R)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/4/17 recommending that plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order 5 be denied. F&R referred to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days.(Kaminski, H)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2017 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED; and Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the FRCP, and the Local Rules of Practice. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iredia-Ortega v. Baker Residential Academic Program University of Cal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Iredia-Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Residential Academic Program University of Cal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bank Ins. Co. Flordia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?