Coleman v. Virga et al
Plaintiff: Robert E. Coleman
Defendant: T. Virga, Jeff Macomber, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Director of CDCR, SAC ICC, T. Hinrichs, M. Rustad, R. L. Heise, Jr., C. Hord and B. Strohmaier
Case Number: 2:2017cv00851
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2020 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 77 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/20/2020 DENYING 68 Motion to Compel in all respects but for request for admission no. 1 addressed to defendant Virga, request for admission nos. 1 and 2 addressed to defendant Hinrich, and request for production of documents no. 5; defendants shall provide plaintiff with further responses to these requests within 30 days of the date of this order. (Tupolo, A)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/01/20 GRANTING 74 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The time to file dispositive motions is extended to June 12, 2020. (Plummer, M)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/30/20 DENYING 73 Motion to Appoint Counsel and DENYING plaintiff's request for a second settlement conference to defendants also joining in the request. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/27/2020 GRANTING 69 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants to file their opposition to 68 Motion to Compel on or before 3/10/2020. (Henshaw, R)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 50 motion for omitted counterclaim, 60 motion to reinstate his motion to compel filed 6/24/2019, 49 motion to compel, 59 request for a subpoena. (Zignago, K.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/4/19 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 54 is construed as objections to the findings and recommendations; Sections I, II, III and V of the findings and recommendations filed 7/3/19 are ADOPTED in full; section IV,1 comprising page 7:3 to page 13:24, of the findings and recommendations filed 7/3/19 is NOT ADOPTED; Plaintiff's motion to amend 47 is DENIED; Defendants' motion to dismiss 41 is DENIED w ithout prejudice to defendants' right to seek summary judgment on the merits of plaintiff's claims against defendants Haring, Hinrich, Lynch and Virga and on the grounds these defendants are entitled to qualified immunity, and this matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Becknal, R)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/03/19 VACATING 45 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 49 Motion to Compel. Defendants Curren, Wright and Wolcott are dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion to amend 47 be denied. Defendants' motion to dismiss 41 be granted. Motions 41 and 47 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/14/19 ORDERING that, within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/10/19 RECOMMENDING that defendant Curren be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/05/18. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/15/2018 ADOPTING in FULL 24 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 15 Motion for Injunctive Relief. (Washington, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/26/2018 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 15 motion for injunctive relief be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/19/18 ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full. Defendants CDCR, Jordan, Morris, Papikian, Barrena, Soto Moyle, Estrada, Doshna,Kernan and Avila are dismissed. (Kaminski, H)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to assign a district judge to this action and RECOMMENDING defendants CDCR, Jordan, Morris, Papikian, Barrena, Soto, Moyle, Estrada, Doshna, Kernan and Avila be dismissed. Assigned and referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/27/2017 GRANTING 2 and 8 Motions to Proceed IFP; DENYING 3 Motion for Injunctive Relief; and DISMISSING 1 Complaint. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff to complete and submit Notice of Amendment with Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the filing fee of $350. All fees collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Virga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAC ICC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Hinrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Heise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Strohmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?