Lott v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lorraine Hagler Lott
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2017cv00986
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/7/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED, and judgment is entered for the Commissioner. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/17, ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is 12/8/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/19/17 GRANTING the plaintiff a first extension of time of 30 days to file her motion for summary judgment. The current due date for plaintiff's motion is September 25, 2017. Following this extension, plaintiff's motion and memorandum in support thereof will now be due on October 25, 2017. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Hagler Lott
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise Gade
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Valizan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?