McElroy v. Warden et al

Plaintiff: Latwahn McElroy
Defendant: Warden, Youssef and CDCR
Case Number: 2:2017cv01042
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/13/18, ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/13/2018 ADOPTING 16 findings and recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED. Plaintiff is accorded fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to submit the full filing fee ($400.00) in order to proceed with this action. If Plaintiff fails to timely submit the full filing fee, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to the parties. (Zignago, K.)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/8/2018 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 17 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/02/18 DENYING AS MOOT 4 , 5 , 6 Motions for court intervention and DENYING AS PREMATURE 15 Motion for court intervention. The clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 12 be denied under 28 U.S.C. 67; 1915(g). Plaintiff be accorded 14 days after the district judge adopts these findings and recommendations to submit the full filing fee $400.00 in order to proceed with this action. If plaintiff fails to timely submit the full filing fee, this action should be dismissed without prejudice. Motion 12 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/3/2018 (Plummer, M).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/13/2017 DENYING 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an application to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/21/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an application to proceed IFP or the required fees of $400. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElroy v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latwahn McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?