Weatherwax v. Teachers Ins. Annuity Assoc., et al.,
Plaintiff: Leslie Weatherwax
Defendant: Teachers Insurance Annuity Association and College Retirement Equity Fund, Princeton University Monthly Employees Retirement Plan and Princeton University Retirement Savings Plan
Case Number: 2:2017cv01050
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/27/17: Defendants' request for a one-month extension to December 13, 2017, in which to file their responsive pleading(s) to the First Amended Complaint, and until Monday, January 8, 2018, for Plaintiff and Defendants to meet and confer concerning a discovery plan is GRANTED. (Kaminski, H)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/17/2017 GRANTING Defendant's Extension of Time to respond to First Amended Complaint until 11/13/2017 and for parties to meet and confer regarding a discovery plan until 12/6/2017. (Hunt, G)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/18/17 GRANTING Defendants' request for a one month extension to Friday, October 13, 2017, in which to file their responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint, and until Monday, November 6, 2017, for Plaintiff and Defendants to meet and confer concerning a discovery plan. (Becknal, R)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/31/17 ORDERING that Defendants' Request for a fourteen day extension to Friday, 9/15/17, in which to file their responsive pleading(s) to the First Amended Complaint, and until Monday, 10/9/17, for Plaintiff and Defendants to meet and confer concerning a discovery plan is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/10/17 ORDERING that Defendants' request for a 28 day extension to 9/1/2017, to file their responsive pleading(s) to the First Amended Complaint, and until 9/25/2017, for Plaintiff and Defendants to meet and confer concerning a discovery plan is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherwax v. Teachers Ins. Annuity Assoc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Insurance Annuity Association and College Retirement Equity Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton University Monthly Employees Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton University Retirement Savings Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Weatherwax
Represented By: Tyson Ellery Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?