Fields v. Castrillo
Plaintiff: Carlton Fields
Defendant: E. F. Castrillo
Case Number: 2:2017cv01068
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/20/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Carlton Fields on 10/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new Custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Deak. (cc: KJN and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/11/18 DENYING 31 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND AMENDED DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/22/18 GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension of time. Defendant's responses served 03/21/18 are deemed timely. Plaintiff's motion to compel disc overy and for sanctions 27 is DENIED as moot. The deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions set forth in the Discovery and Scheduling Order filed 12/27/17 19 at 5, paragraphs 6-7 are extended by 1 month as follows: The parties may conduct discovery until May 25, 2018. Any motions necessary tocompel discovery shall be filed by that date. All requests for discovery pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 31, 33, 34 or 36 shall be served not later than sixty days prior to that date. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before August 24, 2018. Motions shall be briefed in accordance with paragraph 8 of this courts order filed October 19, 2017.(Plummer, M) Modified on 3/23/2018 (Plummer, M).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/07/18 DENYING 21 plaintiff's motion concerning discovery and setting a settlement conference; and DENYING 22 plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel; DENYING 24 , 25 plaintiff's requests for the court's assistance concerning access to the prison law library, legal copies and writing materials. (Plummer, M)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/10/2017 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days after service of this order in which to submit the documents necessary to effect service. (Hunt, G)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/8/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Carlton Fields. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/6/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff, within 30 days from the date of this order, to submit an amended complaint and an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the required fees of $400. (Henshaw, R)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/19/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-01068-AC (PC). Old Case Number 1:17-cv-00668-GSA (PC). (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Castrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. F. Castrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?