Garza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carlos Brown Garza
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01076
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yuba
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/7/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $11,780.00 and costs/expenses in the amount of $136.00, as authorized by 28:1920, 2412(d), subject to the terms of the referenced Stipulation.(Reader, L)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/27/18 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 26 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Kaminski, H)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/9/2018 ORDERING defendant's reply is due 5/30/2018. (Zignago, K.)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/21/18: Defendant shall have an extension of time of an additional 14 days to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. The new due date shall be March 7, 2018.(Kaminski, H)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/22/2018 ORDERING defendant shall have an extension of time to 2/21/2018 to respond to motion for summary judgment. (Zignago, K.)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/3/18, ORDERING that defendant's response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED until 1/22/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/28/2017 EXTENDING time up to and including 12/22/2017, for Defendant to respond to 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and for Plaintiff to have an additional 15 days to file his reply. (York, M)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/24/17: Request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted 3 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brown Garza
Represented By: Barbara Marie Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?