Lewis v. Davis
Petitioner: Milton Otis Lewis
Respondent: Ron Davis
Case Number: 2:2017cv01112
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/2017 RECOMMENDING the petition filed as Case No. 2:17-cv-1112 be dismissed and petitioner be directed to file a motion to amend the petition in the earlier action, 2:02-cv-0013-TLN-EFB, if there are new bases on which he wishes to challenge his conviction or sentence. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due by within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/6/2017 GRANTING counsel for petitioner's request and counsel shall respond to the order to show cause within 90 days. (Yin, K)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/21/2017 ORDERING Petitioner, within 21 days of the date of service of this order, to show cause why the instant petition should not be dismissed and he be directed to consult with his existing counsel in Case No. 2:02-cv-00013-TLN-EFB regarding any additional claims he wishes to present to this court regarding his conviction and sentence. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milton Otis Lewis
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Corey Mann(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Norman Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?