Pickern v. Nord Market, et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Pickern
Defendant: Nord Market, Ibrahim Sayegh and Mary Sayegh
Case Number: 2:2017cv01130
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against All Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/28/2017. (Hunt, G)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/27/17. The Court GRANTS the Request for an extension of time 16 . Plaintiff shall have up to and including 12/1/2017, to provide supplemental authority in support of the requested fees. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/3/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's request for telephonic appearance. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickern v. Nord Market, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Pickern
Represented By: Thomas Edward Frankovich
Represented By: Amanda Richards Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nord Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ibrahim Sayegh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sayegh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?