United States of America v. Real property located at 22043 Weed Court, Red Bluff, California, Tehama County, APN: 035-440-018-000 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real property located at 22043 Weed Court, Red Bluff, California, Tehama County, APN: 035-440-018-000, Real property located at 329 San Mateo Avenue, Gerber, California, Tehama County, APN: 064-182-017-000, Approximately $130,445.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $2,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $23,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $12,676.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $1,010.00 in U.S. Currency, 2011 Mercedes GL 450, License Number 7ABY227, VIN: 4JGBF7BE2BA739064, 2007 Chevrolet Corvette, License Number 7LXP045, VIN: 1G1YY26U675100353, 2013 Mercedes CLS 550, License Number 7WQE461, VIN: WDDLJ7DB9DA059942 and 2008 GMC Yukon, License Number 7WFU289, VIN: 1GKFK13028J130104
Case Number: 2:2017cv01222
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Request for Extension of time to Submit a Joint Status Report signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/17. (Kaminski, H)
June 16, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/15/2017 DIRECTING the United States to publish on the official internet forfeiture site www.forfeiture.gov, for thirty (30) consecutive days: the cour t and case number of this action, the date of seizure/posting, the identity and/or description of the property seized/posted, the name and address of the attorney for the plaintiff, a statement re claims, and a statement re answers/motions as to the 1 Complaint for Forfeiture. (Michel, G.)
June 14, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Clerk's issuance of warrant for arrest of articles in rem signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/13/17, ORDERING the Clerk to issue a warrant for arrest of articles in rem for the defendant currency and vehicles. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real property located at 22043 Weed Court, Red Bluff, California, Tehama County, APN: 035-440-018-000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 22043 Weed Court, Red Bluff, California, Tehama County, APN: 035-440-018-000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 329 San Mateo Avenue, Gerber, California, Tehama County, APN: 064-182-017-000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $130,445.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $2,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $23,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $12,676.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,010.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Mercedes GL 450, License Number 7ABY227, VIN: 4JGBF7BE2BA739064
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Chevrolet Corvette, License Number 7LXP045, VIN: 1G1YY26U675100353
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Mercedes CLS 550, License Number 7WQE461, VIN: WDDLJ7DB9DA059942
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 GMC Yukon, License Number 7WFU289, VIN: 1GKFK13028J130104
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?