Ligons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Ligons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01283
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/7/2019 IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $3,913.00 as authorized by 28:2412, and costs in the amount of $400.00 as authorized by 28:1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (Reader, L)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/20/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING the Commissioner's 15 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in plaintiff's favor and close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/3/18, ORDERING that plaintiff shall have until 1/11/2018 to file motion for summary judgment. All other deadlines set forth in the 3 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/29/17: Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include December 27, 2017, in which to file Motion for summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ligons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Ligons
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ben A. Porter, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?