Hardin v. Baughman et al
Plaintiff: Leon Hardin
Defendant: D. Baughman, B. Dennis, R. Sparks and D. Gonzales
Case Number: 2:2017cv01340
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/25/2021 DENYING 49 Motion for Reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/21/2021 DENYING 46 Motion for Extension of Time. (Rodriguez, E)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/2021 ADOPTING 36 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING 34 & 37 Requests to Withdraw from the Settlement Agreement and Re-Open Case. (Coll, A)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/22/2021 GRANTING 39 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may file objections to 36 Findings and Recommendations within 21 days of the service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/27/21 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's request to withdraw from the settlement agreement and re-open the case 34 be denied. Request 34 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days.(Plummer, M)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/04/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Leon Hardin on 4/04/19 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: CKD and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/28/18 DISMISSING named defendants Baughman and Gonzalez without prejudice. This action shall proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claims. (Benson, A.)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Leon Hardin signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/24/18. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/17. New Case Number 2:17-cv-1340-AC. Old Case Number 1:17-cv-00851-SAB. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Baughman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?