Sacramento Suburban Water District v. Elementis Chromium Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sacramento Suburban Water District
Defendant: Honeywell Incorporated, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, BASF Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, United States of America, Honeywell International Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Luxfer Holdings PLC and Univar Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2017cv01353
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Clifton J. McFarland. Attorney McFarland, Clifton J. added. (McFarland, Clifton)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/10/20 ENLARGING the page limit for U.S.'s Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion to Dismiss by 15 pages, not to exceed 35 pages. (Benson, A.)
March 4, 2020 Filing 107 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Enlarged Page Limit for Defendant United States' Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion to Dismiss by United States of America. (Howard, Shari)
February 27, 2020 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Bailey, Landon)
February 27, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Richard Ramones by Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Bailey, Landon) Modified on 2/27/2020 (Kaminski, H).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/2020 LIFTING STAY, SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, and DENYING as MOOT #93 Motion to Lift Stay. Within 60 days of entry of this Order, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' operative complaints by either (a) answering, (b) filing a new Motion to Dismiss, or (c) amending or withdrawing a pending Motion to Dismiss. The party filing such a motion shall select a hearing date no sooner than 120 days after entry of this Order. Within 90 days of entry of this Order, each Plaintiff shall respond to any pending Motion to Dismiss by filing an opposition or by amending its complaint. Defendants shall have 105 days from the entry of this Order to file any reply in support of their Motion(s) to Dismiss. Should either Plaintiff respond to a motion to dismiss by amending its complaint, the following briefing schedule shall apply: Within 60 days of the filing of an amended complaint, Defendants shall respond to such amended complaint(s) by answering or filing a Motion to Dismiss. The party filing such a motion shall select a hearing date no sooner than 120 days after the filing of the amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to a Motion to Dismiss an amended complaint within 90 days of the filing of an amended complaint. Defendants shall have 105 days from the filing of an amended complaint to file any reply in support of a Motion to Dismiss. All discovery is STAYED until 45 days after all Defendants remaining in the action answer following the Court's resolution of any motions to dismiss filed by any Defendant. The deadline for the parties to exchange Initial Disclosures is DEFERRED to 45 days after all Defendants remaining in the action answer following the Court's resolution of any motions to dismiss filed by any Defendant. (York, M)
February 4, 2020 Filing 103 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Lifting Stay and Setting Briefing Schedule by Sacramento Suburban Water District. (Sloane, Timothy)
January 30, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shari Howard, GOVT on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Howard, Shari added. (Howard, Shari)
January 13, 2020 Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/13/2020: In light of the Minute Order submitting the motion related to the Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. 99 ), Defendant's pending Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No. #98 ) is DENIED as moot. (Text Only Entry) (Michel, G.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY by Sacramento Suburban Water District in support of #93 Motion to Lift Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sloane, Timothy) Modified on 1/14/2020 (Benson, A.).
January 10, 2020 Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/2020: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay (ECF No. #93 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 1/17/2020 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Michel, G.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 98 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 1/17/2020 hearing re #93 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay, by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weirick, Stephanie) Modified on 1/10/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
December 13, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephanie Bonnett Weirick on behalf of Honeywell International Inc.. Attorney Weirick, Stephanie Bonnett added. (Weirick, Stephanie)
December 10, 2019 Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay (ECF No. #93 ) set for 12/20/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Motion briefing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 6, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephanie N. Kang on behalf of Honeywell International Inc.. Attorney Kang, Stephanie N. added. (Kang, Stephanie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 94 OPPOSITION by BASF Corporation to #93 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber M. Trincado in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Trincado, Amber)
November 1, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Lift Stay by Sacramento Suburban Water District. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sloane, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/20/19. Added attorney John McGahren, PHV for Elementis Chromium Incorporated. (Kaminski, H)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/17/19. Added attorney Francis A. Citera, PHV for Univar Incorporated. (Coll, A)
September 17, 2019 Filing 90 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Ella Burn Foley-Gannon for Elementis Chromium Incorporated (Foley-Gannon, Ella)
September 11, 2019 Filing 89 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Univar Incorporated for attorney Francis A. Citera to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8455308) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Deepi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the parties' disagreement as to whether the stay in this case remains appropriate, the court declines to hold a status conference. Plaintiff may, however, file a noticed motion to lift the stay. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 10, 2019 Filing 87 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Elementis Chromium Incorporated for attorney John McGahren to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8451630) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Grewal, Gurinder)
September 6, 2019 Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller GRANTING Defendant's Proposed Substitution of Attorney (ECF No. #83 ). Accordingly, Attorney Deepi Miller is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendant Univar USA Inc. in place of Attorney William L. Alexander. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 29, 2019 Filing 85 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Gurinder Singh Grewal for Elementis Chromium Incorporated, attorney Ellie Frances Chapman and Greg A. Christianson terminated (Grewal, Gurinder)
August 27, 2019 Filing 84 REQUEST for Status Conference and Defendants' Statement in Opposition by Sacramento Suburban Water District. (Sloane, Timothy) Modified on 8/28/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 26, 2019 Filing 83 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Univar USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Deepi)
July 23, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of ENTRY of JUDGMENT by Sacramento Suburban Water District. (Sloane, Timothy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Domagala Mitchell on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Mitchell, David Domagala added. (Mitchell, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Jay E. Smith. (Smith, Jay)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge *Gregory G. Hollows* from the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman* for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
July 18, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of ATTORNEY of RECORD by United States of America. (Henneman, Bethany) Modified on 7/20/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/10/2018 ORDERING that the Court will treat Non-Government Defendants' #27 , #45 Rule 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss as if filed in response to Plaintiff's SAC. The schedule for subsequent briefing, including Plaintiff's opposition to Non-Government Defendant's motions to dismiss and Non-Government Defendants' replies, will be determined pursuant to the #73 Stipulation to Stay Actions and File Amended Complaint, filed on 3/20/2018, once the further stay has been lifted. (Zignago, K.)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/4/2018 ORDERING case STAYED and to file Amended Complaint. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2018 Filing 75 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Treat Non-Government Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss as Applicable to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by BASF Corporation. (Trincado, Amber)
March 20, 2018 Filing 74 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, Luxfer Holdings PLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, United States of America, Honeywell International Inc., Univar USA Inc. by Sacramento Suburban Water District.(Sloane, Timothy)
March 20, 2018 Filing 73 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Staying Actions and to File Amended Complaint by Sacramento Suburban Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sloane, Timothy)
March 1, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Bonneville on behalf of Sigma-Aldrich Corporation. Attorney Bonneville, Jennifer B. added. (Bonneville, Jennifer)
February 27, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Bethany Joy Henneman. (Henneman, Bethany)
February 27, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Michael L. Williams. (Williams, Michael)
February 15, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jay E. Smith on behalf of Sigma-Aldrich Corporation. Attorney Smith, Jay E. added. (Smith, Jay)
February 13, 2018 Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is SET for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 12, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #27 Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing SET for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Smith, Gary) Modified on 2/13/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 12, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #45 Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing SET for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Morris, Sean) Modified on 2/13/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 7, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Schrama on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Schrama, Michael Alan added. (Schrama, Michael)
February 7, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Charles Cook on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Cook, Geoffrey Charles added. (Cook, Geoffrey)
February 1, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of ENTRY of ORDER in Plaintiff's Actions from the US COURT of FEDERAL CLAIMS by Sacramento Suburban Water District. (Sloane, Timothy) Modified on 2/2/2018 (York, M).
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/18/2018 ORDERING attorney Carlos M. Bollar ADDED PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Hunt, G)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/18/2018 ORDERING attorney Stephen M. Packman ADDED PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Hunt, G)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/18/2018 ORDERING attorney Richard Ramones ADDED PHV for Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Hunt, G)
December 27, 2017 Filing 59 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Luxfer Holdings PLC for attorney Richard J. Ramones to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7429103) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Landon)
December 27, 2017 Filing 58 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Luxfer Holdings PLC for attorney Stephen M. Packman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7429078) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Landon)
December 27, 2017 Filing 57 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Luxfer Holdings PLC for attorney Carlos Manuel Bollar to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bailey, Landon David added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7429033) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Landon)
November 8, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by R. Morgan Gilhuly. (Gilhuly, R.)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER TO STAY ACTION signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/17. These actions are hereby stayed against the Non-Federal Defendants until sixty (60) days after Plaintiffs file such notification.The hearing date on the currently filed motions, set for 11/17/17, at10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. Discovery is STAYED until the Court issues rulings on the Non-Federal Defendants' currently pending Rule 12 motions and any motions to dismiss filed by the United States pursuant to the deadlines entered by the Court on 9/25/17 for all counts against the United States. Initial disclosures under FRCP 26 (a)(1) shall be due 45 days after this Court's ruling on all then-pending Rule 12 motions. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 11/17/17 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 10, 2017 Filing 54 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stay of Action by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Gilhuly, R.)
October 4, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael L. Williams on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Williams, Michael L. added. (Williams, Michael)
September 28, 2017 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Elementis Chromium Incorporated. (Chapman, Ellie)
September 28, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Matthew K. Edling. (Edling, Matthew)
September 28, 2017 Filing 50 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Luxfer Holdings PLC served on 8/21/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
September 28, 2017 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 12/14/2017 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on any defendant not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 26, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bethany Joy Henneman on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Henneman, Bethany Joy added. (Henneman, Bethany)
September 25, 2017 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Honeywell Incorporated. (Morris, Sean)
September 25, 2017 Filing 46 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Honeywell Incorporated in re #45 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E)(Morris, Sean)
September 25, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to DISMISS by Honeywell Incorporated. Motion Hearing SET for 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Morris, Sean)
September 25, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sean O. Morris on behalf of Honeywell Incorporated. Attorney Morris, Sean O. added. (Morris, Sean)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY Plaintiff's counts against the United States of America and Scheduling order for Defendant United States of America signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/25/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 25, 2017 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Univar Incorporated. (Alexander, William)
September 22, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew Thomas Mortl on behalf of E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company. Attorney Mortl, Andrew Thomas added. (Mortl, Andrew)
September 22, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Adam M. Rapp on behalf of E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company. Attorney Rapp, Adam M. added. (Rapp, Adam)
September 21, 2017 Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Staying Plaintiff's Counts against the US by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alford, Thomas)
September 21, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Alford on behalf of United States of America. (Alford, Thomas)
September 21, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Alford on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Alford, Thomas J. added. (Alford, Thomas)
September 20, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Errata by PPG Incorporated re #27 MOTION to DISMISS. (Smith, Gary) Modified on 9/21/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 20, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bailey J. Langner on behalf of BASF Corporation. Attorney Langner, Bailey J. added. (Langner, Bailey)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/19/2017 re: Scheduling and Case Management. All defendants named in this stipulation will file responsive pleadings by 9/25/2017. Plaintiff's response due by 10/25/2017. Defendants reply briefs due by 11/8/2017.(Donati, J)
September 20, 2017 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Dow Chemical Company. (Wong, Vincent)
September 19, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gennaro August Filice, III on behalf of BASF Corporation. Attorney Filice, Gennaro August added. (Filice, Gennaro)
September 19, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David M. Metres on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation. Attorney Metres, David M. added. (Metres, David)
September 19, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephen C. Lewis on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation. Attorney Lewis, Stephen C. added. (Lewis, Stephen)
September 19, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by R. Morgan Gilhuly on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation. Attorney Gilhuly, R. Morgan added. (Gilhuly, R.)
September 18, 2017 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant PPG Incorporated. (Smith, Gary)
September 18, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to DISMISS by PPG Incorporated. Attorney Smith, Gary J. added. Motion Hearing SET for 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Smith, Gary) Modified on 9/19/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 18, 2017 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Luxfer Holdings PLC. (Bailey, Landon)
September 18, 2017 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Gilhuly, R.)
September 18, 2017 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Trincado, Amber)
September 18, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Megan Ritsu Nishikawa on behalf of BASF Corporation. Attorney Nishikawa, Megan Ritsu added. (Nishikawa, Megan)
September 14, 2017 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Sigma-Aldrich Corporation. (Smith, Jay)
September 14, 2017 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Scheduling and Case Management by BASF Corporation. Attorney Trincado, Amber Melia added. (Trincado, Amber)
August 24, 2017 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Dow Chemical Company served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sigma-Aldrich Corporation served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Univar Incorporated served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: PPG Incorporated served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: BASF Corporation served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Occidental Chemical Corporation served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Elementis Chromium Incorporated served on 7/27/2017, answer due 8/17/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Sacramento Suburban Water District. Attorney Edling, Matthew K. added. United States of America served on 7/27/2017, answer due 9/25/2017. (Edling, Matthew)
August 21, 2017 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company. (Rapp, Adam)
August 21, 2017 Filing 10 STIPULATION that defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to 09/18/17 by Occidental Chemical Corporation. Attorney Barg, John Frank added. (Barg, John) Modified on 8/22/2017 (Benson, A.).
August 17, 2017 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Univar Incorporated. Attorney Alexander, William L. added.(Alexander, William)
August 4, 2017 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Sentencing Memorandum, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/02/17 ORDERING that this case be RELATED to case number 2:17-cv-1349 KJM GGH and that this related case be REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in this case are VACATED. District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire are no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:17-cv-1353 KJM GGH. (cc: TLN, AC). (Benson, A.)
July 24, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:17-cv-01349 by Sacramento Suburban Water District. Attorney Sloane, Timothy R. added. (Sloane, Timothy)
July 14, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Victor M. Sher* *Sher Edling LLP* *425 California Street, Suite 810* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2017 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, Honeywell Incorporated, Luxfer Holdings PLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, Univar Incorporated, United States of America by Sacramento Suburban Water District.(Sher, Victor)
July 5, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A)
July 5, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *BASF Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, Honeywell Incorporated, Luxfer Holdings PLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, Univar Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Victor M. Sher* *Sher Edling LLP* *425 California St., Ste. 810* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A)
June 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Elementis Chromium Incorporated, Honeywell Incorporated, Luxfer Holdings PLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, PPG Incorporated, Sigma-Aldrich Corporation, Univar Incorporated by Sacramento Suburban Water District. Attorney Sher, Victor M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7138788) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sher, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacramento Suburban Water District v. Elementis Chromium Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Suburban Water District
Represented By: Victor M. Sher
Represented By: Timothy R. Sloane
Represented By: Matthew K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Incorporated
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Adam M. Rapp
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Mortl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Amber Melia Trincado
Represented By: Bailey Langner
Represented By: Gennaro August Filice, III
Represented By: Megan Ritsu Nishikawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Incorporated
Represented By: Gary J. Smith
Represented By: Kaitlyn D. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: David M. Metres
Represented By: John Frank Barg
Represented By: Stephen C. Lewis
Represented By: R. Morgan Gilhuly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma-Aldrich Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer B. Bonneville
Represented By: Jay E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementis Chromium Incorporated
Represented By: Ella Burn Foley-Gannon
Represented By: Greg A. Christianson
Represented By: Ellie Frances Chapman
Represented By: Gurinder Singh Grewal
Represented By: John McGahren, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas J. Alford
Represented By: Michael L. Williams
Represented By: Shari Howard, GOVT
Represented By: David Domagala Mitchell
Represented By: Bethany Joy Henneman
Represented By: Michael Alan Schrama
Represented By: Geoffrey Charles Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie N. Kang
Represented By: Stephanie Bonnett Weirick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Clifton J. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxfer Holdings PLC
Represented By: Richard Ramones, PHV
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Represented By: Carlos M. Bollar, PHV
Represented By: Stephen M. Packman, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Incorporated
Represented By: Deepi Miller
Represented By: Francis A. Citera, PHV
Represented By: William L. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?