Waltrip v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Waltrip
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01390
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/19/18 DENYING plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING Commissioner's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/15/18 ORDERING that the Request for extension of time is GRANTED; Plaintiff is GRANTED a fourteen-day extension of time from the current 2/16/18 deadline to file Plaintiff's Reply Brief to 3/2/2018.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/29/17 ORDERING that the deadline for plaintiff to file opening brief is EXTENDED to 12/27/17. (Benson, A.)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/12/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the clerk to issue process. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a n original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, and five copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (cc USM) (Washington, S) Modified on 7/13/2017 (Washington, S).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waltrip v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Waltrip
Represented By: Josephine Mary Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?