January 19, 2023 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/18/2023 DIRECTING the defendants to file an answer to the 10 First Amended Complaint within 21 days of the service of this order. (Perdue, C.)
|
January 17, 2023 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/17/2023 ADOPTING in FULL 41 Findings and Recommendations. DENYING 37 Motion to Dismiss the first amended complaint 37 , and this matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge.(Reader, L)
|
October 27, 2021 |
Filing
41
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/26/21 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss the first amended complaint 37 be denied. Motion 37 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
|
March 2, 2021 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/01/21 LIFTING the STAY of this action. Within 21 days of the filing of this order, defendants shall file a response to the complaint.(Plummer, M)
|
February 10, 2021 |
Filing
34
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/09/21 VACATING 32 previous writ issued for inmate's attendance on 2/17/21. The Custodian is ordered to produce Mark A. Jones by zoom video conference on 2/22/21 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new Custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and KJN)(Plummer, M)
|
January 19, 2021 |
Filing
32
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/15/21 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Mark A. Jones by Zoom video conference on 2/17/21 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and KJN)(Plummer, M)
|
November 5, 2020 |
Filing
25
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/05/20 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by zoom video conference Mark A. Jones on 12/15/20 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and KJN)(Plummer, M)
|
October 29, 2020 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/28/2020 ADOPTING 13 Findings and Recommendations in full. The claims against defendants Senogor, San Joaquin General Hospital, and Baker are DISMISSED without leave to amend. (Zignago, K.)
|
September 25, 2020 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/24/20 DENYING 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
|
August 11, 2020 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/10/20 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Plummer, M)
|
November 19, 2018 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Mark A. Jones signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/2018. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
|