Brooks v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Timothy Bryan Brooks
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv01430
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/19 RECOMMENDING that this action be Dismissed and that the clerk be Directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/7/18 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DISMISSING 1 Complaint with leave to amend; and GRANTING plaintiff 30 days after being served with this order to file an amended complaint. (Coll, A)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/12/2017 DENYING 3 Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bryan Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?