Crowder v. Fox, et al.
Plaintiff: Tristain Crowder
Defendant: Robert W. Fox, Felix Hopper, Ronald Hadrava and C. Santos
Case Number: 2:2017cv01657
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/13/2020 EXTENDING the stay of proceedings until 10/1/2020. (Zignago, K.)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/23/2020 EXTENDING the stay of the proceedings in this matter to 7/1/2020. (Yin, K)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/29/20 ORDERING this case is stayed pending the outcome of mediation. If the case does not resolve at the mediation, the parties have stipulated to extend the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading until 3 weeks after the attendance of the mediation.(Plummer, M)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/28/2019 ADOPTING in FULL 38 Findings and Recommendations. DENYING 28 Motion for Misjoinder, and GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 27 Motion to Dismiss. DISMISSING Plaintiff's 17 First Amended Complaint, with leave to amend, and Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. (Reader, L)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for misjoinder 28 be denied. Defendants' motion to dismiss 27 be granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief as moot be denied. Motions 27 and 28 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/24/2019 VACATING the scheduling conference set for 7/10/2019, pending resolution of defendants' motions. (Yin, K)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/21/2019 APPROVING the parties' 22 stipulation. Defendants shall have until 5/10/2019 to respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint. (Yin, K)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/6/18 GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days of the date of this order to file a first amended complaint. (Coll, A)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/19/2018 DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tristain Crowder signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/13/2018. Plaintiff's 2 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in a ccordance with this order. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Sacramento Division signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/10/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowder v. Fox, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristain Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Hadrava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?