Myrtle Street Flats LLC, v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Myrtle Street Flats LLC
Defendant: City of Vallejo, Vincent Sproete, Jack McArthur, Daniel E. Keen, Lonell Butler, Robert Chambers, Michelle Hightower and Emergency Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01662
Filed: August 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/2020 CONTINUING the Pretrial Conference to 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM and the Trial to 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/2019 GRANTING 70 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims against Emergency Construction Services, Inc. (York, M)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 03/19/19 MODIFYING this Court's 45 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order as follows: Discovery reset to 3/29/19; Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment reset to 12/10/19 at 01:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/7/20 at 10:00 AM; and Trial reset for 3/30/20 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Becknal, R)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/15/19 GRANTING 61 Motion for Protective Order. (Kaminski, H)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion to compel (ECF No. 47 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Defendant City of Vallejo shall promptly make further efforts to confirm with appr opriate persons/custodians that all responsive text messages, voicemails, and call logs have been produced. Within 21 days of this order, the City of Vallejo shall either make a supplemental production of such items or provide plaintiff with a fi rm representation that no such responsive text messages, voicemails, or call logs exist; Within 21 days of this order, defendant City of Vallejo shall provide plaintiff with a supplemental, itemized privilege log for all pre-litigation documents ( i.e., documents that were generated prior to the initiation of this lawsuit) that were withheld based on the attorney-client privilege, work product doctrine, or any other privilege; All of plaintiff's remaining requests are DENIED without prej udice, subject to further good faith meet-and-confer efforts by the parties as discussed in greater detail at the hearing. The parties are cautioned that failure to properly meet and confer prior to bringing a discovery dispute before the court may result in the imposition of sanctions on the offending party or parties. (Becknal, R)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STATUS PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 03/29/2018 ORDERING that all Dispositive Motions filed by 05/07/2019 and heard 06/04/2019 at 1:30 p.m.; Discovery completed by 03/29/2019; joint mid-litigation statements due 14 day s prior to close of discovery; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 01/25/2019 with any supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures due by 02/15/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez with a joint pretrial statement due 7 days prior; Jury Trial set for 08/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 7 days. (Fabillaran, J)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/1/2018. (York, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/27/2017 GRANTING-IN-PART 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. During the pendency of this litigation, Defendant City of Vallejo is ORDERED AND ENJOINED to remove the Emergency Summary Abatement is sued concerning 624 Marin on May 31, 2017, to restoreutility service to 624 Marin. The remainder of Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED. Defendants 12 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Individual Defendants Vincent Sproete, Jack McArthur, Daniel E. Keen, Lonell Butler, Robert Chambers, and Michelle Hightower are hereby DISMISSED from this action. (Hunt, G)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/22/2017 ORDERING Pursuant to Local Rule 271, the parties hereby agree to submit the entitled action to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. (Reader, L)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/17, ORDERING that Defendant Emergency Construction Services, Inc.'s answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on 12/14/17 or 21 days after the filing of an amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/23/2017 CONTINUING the deadline to complete the joint status report to 11/21/2017. (Hunt, G)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/16/2017 ORDERING Defendant Emergency Construction Services, Inc.'s answer to 1 Complaint is due on 11/14/2017 or twenty-one (21) days after the filing of an amended complaint. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrtle Street Flats LLC, v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Street Flats LLC
Represented By: Frank Busch
Represented By: James M. Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Sproete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonell Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?