Pierce v. Frink et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy A. Pierce
Defendant: Nelson C. Frink, Cook Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01731
Filed: August 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana.CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY, AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/31/2017: IT IS ORDERED that 7 Defendants' Motion to stay be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 8 Plaintiff's Motion to remand be, and the same hereby is, DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER 9 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/29/2017 continuing 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Frink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy A. Pierce
Represented By: Pedro De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson C. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Represented By: Howard David Ruddell
Represented By: Howard David Ruddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Represented By: Howard David Ruddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Represented By: Howard David Ruddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?