Ontiveros v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Herman Rene Ontiveros
Defendant: Chief Medical Officer
Case Number: 2:2017cv01740
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/14/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion For Reinstatement 31 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Herman Rene Ontiveros signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/5/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and for ward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/24/2017 DISMISSING without prejudice 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontiveros v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Rene Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Medical Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?