TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Marker Oil Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.
Defendant: Marker Oil Company, Inc. and Billy Leon Marker, Jr
Case Number: 2:2017cv01768
Filed: August 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/30/2019 ORDERING Judgment Debtor Exam is CONTINUED to 9/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes.(Reader, L)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/8/19 CONTINUING the Judgment Debtor Exam to 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Kastilahn, A)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/7/2019 ORDERING Marker Oil Company, Inc. to appear for Judgment Debtor Exam on 6/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Zignago, K.)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/2018 ORDERING 62 the Court GRANTS in PART and DENIES in PART Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Taxable Costs and ORDERS Defendants to pay Plaintiff: $102,293.00 in attorneys' fees, in addition to the $15,000 previously awarded, ECF No. 51 ; and $12,413.16 in nontaxable expenses. (Reader, L)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/2018 in favor of Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. and against Defendants Marker Oil Company, Inc, and Billy Leon Marker, Jr., jointly and severally, in the amount of $1,079,110.40. (Fabillaran, J)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/4/18 GRANTING Final Default Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/11/2018 GRANTING 38 Motion for Contempt. The Court SANCTIONS Defendants, jointly and severally, and orders them to pay $139,653.28 to TCFIF within 30 days after entry of this order as compen sation for the eight units. The Court further orders Defendants, jointly and severally, to pay an additional $15,000.00 to TCFIF within 30 days after entry of this order as reimbursement to TCFIF for its reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. (Zignago, K.)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/5/2018 RECOMMENDING that 26 motion to vacate the Clerk's entry of default judgment be granted, 25 default judgment be vacated, 26 motion for default judgment by the Court be denied without prejudice to renewal, and Defendants be ordered to file a motion seeking to set aside the entry of default within 14 days of an order adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to District Judge John A. Mendez.Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/9/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 1/18/18 Motion for leave to file a sur-reply 35 is GRANTED. The undersigned will consider Plaintiff's sur-reply filed on 1/18/18 (ECF No. 35 -1); and The 2/16/18 hearing of Plaintiff's Motion is VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/26/2017 ORDERING Within 21 days of the 11/17/2017 hearing, defendant Billy Marker Jr., shall file statement addressing whether he intends to defend this action if plaintiff's 26 motion to vacate the Clerk's entry of default judgment is granted; Within 28 days of the 11/17/2017 hearing, plaintiff shall file a statement; The Clerk of the Court shall enter the appearance of Billy Marker Jr., and serve a copy of this order on him. (Reader, L)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Marker Oil Company, Inc. and Billy Leon Marker, Jr. in the principal amount of $1,071,192.69. (Benson, A.)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for WRIT of POSSESSION signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/11/2017 ORDERING defendant Marker Oil Company Inc. to TRANSFER possession of the property described in Exhibit 1 and any keys, titles, manufacturer's statement or certific ate of origin, and other documentation relating to the property described in Exhibit 1 to TCFIF without delay. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue a Writ of Possession DIRECTING the United States Marshal to seize and deliver the property described in Exhibit 1 to TCFIF. The United States Marshal may enter 205 N. Main Street, Alturas, CA 96101 to take possession of the property listed in Exhibit 1. (Donati, J)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/31/17. This Temporary Restraining Order shall expire on 9/13/2017 unless otherwise extended by this Court. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is SET for 9/12/2017 at 01:30 PM i n Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The Court will also hear TCFIF's application for a writ of possession on 9/12/2017 at 01:30 PM. Any response to the application and entry of a preliminary injunction and to the application for writ of possession shall be filed and served on or before 9/6/2017 at 5:00 p.m. FCFIF may file a reply by 9/8/2017 at 5:00 p.m. (Kastilahn, A) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/1/2017) (Kastilahn, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Marker Oil Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Bay, PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey Neal Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marker Oil Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Leon Marker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?