Medford v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al.,
Plaintiff: Debra Lynn Medford
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Citimortgage, Inc., Citicorp Mortgage Securities, Inc. and Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01783
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/02/18 EXTENDING time to 10/11/18 for Plaintiff file the Amended Complaint. (Benson, A.)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/6/2018 GRANTING Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within twenty days. (Zignago, K.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/17/2018 EXTENDING the fact discovery cutoff to 4/25/2019. All deadlines set forth in the Court's Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order shall be amended accordingly. (York, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/27/2017 EXTENDING time to no later than 12/6/2017, for Defendants to file any reply to their 6 Motion to Dismiss. (York, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medford v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lynn Medford
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Alexandra Costanza Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Costanza Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citicorp Mortgage Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Costanza Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?