Ramnanan v. Abukalam et al
Plaintiff: Andre Ramnanan
Defendant: M Abukalam, S. Peterson and J. Lizarraga
Case Number: 2:2017cv01801
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/18/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Andre Ramnanan on 1/15/19 at 9:00 a.m. at California State Prison Sacramento before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: KJN)(Plummer, M)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2018 ORDERING plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint as outlined in the 1/8/2018 screening order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, the case will proceed o n the original complaint as screened and the claims against defendants Lizarraga and Peterson and his claims against defendant Abukalam for property destruction and retaliation based upon confiscation of evidence will remain dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a prisoner complaint form.(Yin, K)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/8/2018 GRANTING 8 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING with leave to amend all claims against defendants Lizarraga and Peterson and claims against Abukalam for property destruction and ret aliation based on covering up evidence. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff has option to proceed im mediately against Abukalam on retaliation claim based upon being threatened for filing a grievance as set forth in Section V in this order or amend the complaint. Within 14 days of service of this order, plaintiff to complete and return the attached form notifying the court whether he wants to proceed on the screened complaint or file a first amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/02/17 GRANTING 6 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff shall have until 10/18/17 to submit his application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Plummer, M)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/1/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a signed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramnanan v. Abukalam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Abukalam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Ramnanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?