White v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Sekayi R. White
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv01829
Filed: September 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/25/19 GRANTING 21 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims arising under the Federal Tort Claims Act are DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/7/2017 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted up to and including 2/5/2018 in which to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/6/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING 1 Complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of service to file an amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sekayi R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?