Lenkner et al v. County of Tehama
Plaintiff: Robert Lenkner, Matt Jacuzzi, Fred Bickert, Ken Ziu Thang, Shannon F. Saetern, John Alderton, Aaaron Standish Mathisen, Elizabeth Merry, Connie Bilton, Randolph Bilton and Bilton Family Revocable Trust
Defendant: County of Tehama
Case Number: 2:2017cv01839
Filed: September 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/19 MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Dispositive Motions filed by 5/7/19. Hearing on Dispositive Motions on 6/4/19. Joint pre-trial statement filed by 7/12/19. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/19 at 10:00 AM and Trial set for 8/26/19 at 09:00 AM both in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Coll, A)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 01/29/19 VACATING the 01/31/19 hearing on 51 , 52 , 52 Motions for Sanctions. The Defendant's motions are submitted on the briefs without oral argument due to plaintiffs' failure to file timely responses thereto. (Benson, A.)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/18/19 DENYING 49 , 50 , 54 , 55 , 56 , and 57 Motions for Terminating Sanctions as moot and DENYING defendant's request for reasonable expenses under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a)(5)(A) as to plaintiffs Bilton Family Revocable Trust, Robert Lenkner, Aaron Standish Mathisen, Elizabeth Merry, Connie Bilton, and Randolph Bilton. (Coll, A)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/2019 DISMISSING with prejudice plaintiffs Bilton Family Revocable Trust, Robert Lenkner, Aaaron Standish Mathisen, Elizabeth Merry, Connie Bilton and Randolph Bilton. (Washington, S)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/6/2018 GRANTING the defendant's motions to compel (Docs. 33 , 34 , 36 , 37 , 38 , 39 , 40 , 41 , 42 , 43 , 44 , and 45 ). Plaintiffs shall provide verified responses to the di scovery requests on or before 12/14/2018. Such responses shall be without objection, objections having been waived by plaintiffs' failure to serve timely responses. The court further orders plaintiffs' verifications each be notarized. P laintiff John Alderton shall appear for his deposition on or before 12/14/2018. The court further awards $5,827.20 in reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to fully comply with this order may be grounds for terminating and/or other sanctions. (Becknal, R)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/1/18 DISMISSING Plaintiff Matt Jacuzzi with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear their own Attorneys' fees and costs.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/05/18 CONTINIUNG the following dates: Last day to complete discovery: 12/14/18; Last day to file dispositive motions: 02/19/19; Hearing on dispositive motions: 03/19/19 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez and Jury Trial set for 6/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/6/2017 GRANTING 14 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' amended complaint must be filed within 20 days from the date of this Order. The 23 Motion to Amend is DISMISSED as moot. (York, M)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS (Pre-trialScheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/9/17. All dispositive motions shall be filed by 12/11/2018. Hearing on such motions shall be on 1/8/2019 at 1:30 p.m. All discovery shall be completed by 10/15/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/14/2018, and expert rebuttal disclosure due by 8/28/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is SET for 3/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/11/2017 DENYING 1 Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenkner et al v. County of Tehama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lenkner
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Jacuzzi
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Bickert
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Ziu Thang
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon F. Saetern
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alderton
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaaron Standish Mathisen
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Merry
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Bilton
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Bilton
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilton Family Revocable Trust
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tehama
Represented By: Stephen E. Horan
Represented By: David R. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?