Turner v. Byer
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Defendant: S. Byer
Case Number: 2:2017cv01869
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/12/19 ORDERING Mr. Alexander Nowinski is appointed as counsel for Mr. Turner for the limitedpurpose of obtaining his medical records and submitting them to the court. Within 60 days from the d ate of service of this order, plaintiff (through Mr. Nowinski) shall submit, to the court and under seal, all of Mr. Turners medical records which date from July 2018 to the present. Plaintiff is directed to Local Rule 141 for the procedure to submit documents to be sealed. The court will defer ruling on defendants motion to dismiss 38 untilplaintiffs motion to appoint counsel is resolved. (Plummer, M)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/16/2019 DENYING 20 Motion for Default Hearing; GRANTING 27 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; and ORDERING Defendant to formally file and serve motion to dismiss or other response to complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/15/2019 DENYING 34 Motion to Stay. (Henshaw, R)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/26/2019 ORDERING the Clerk shall serve on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General, a copy of plaintiff's 1 complaint; the 8 court's screening order; plaintiff' ;s 17 Request for Entry of Default; the 18 Clerk's Entry of Default; and plaintiff's 20 Motion for Default Hearing. The Office of the Attorney General shall have 14 days from the date of this order tofile any motion regarding the entry of default. (Yin, K)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/13/2018 DENYING 22 Request for Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lafonzo R. Turner signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/17/2018. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit either the filing fee or an IFP application within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?