Benson v. Spearman
Petitioner: Jimmy Lee Benson
Respondent: M.E. Spearman
Case Number: 2:2017cv01881
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Full signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/2018 PARTIALLY GRANTING 13 Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING this action without prejudice; The court DECLINES to issue the COA. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/4/2018 RECOMMENDING 13 Motion to Dismiss be partially granted and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a signed IFP application. (Henshaw, R)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/13/17 ORDERING petitioner shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Lee Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?