Candler v. Baker, et al.,

Plaintiff: Keith Candler
Defendant: Baker, Gonzalez, Marquez, Rashid and Whitehead
Case Number: 2:2017cv01885
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/16/17: The Clerk of the Court shall provide to plaintiff a blank summons, a copy of the October 4, 2017 first amended complaint, and one USM-285 form and instructions for service of process on defendant Rashid. The amended complaint does not state any claims against defendant Palko and, consequently, the Clerk of Court shall terminate him as a party to this action. (Kaminski, H)
October 12, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/11/2017 GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time. The court will screen plaintiff's first amended complaint by separate order and Defendants' answer due 30 days from the date the court enters its new screening order. (Henshaw, R)
September 25, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/22/17 ORDERING if plaintiff believes that a remand of this case to state court is legally proper, he may file a motion to remand within 30 days of this order's entry. (Plummer, M)
September 13, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/13/17 ORDERING plaintiff must submit an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of this order within 30 days. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candler v. Baker, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Candler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquez
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitehead
Represented By: Laraya M. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?