Tran v. Baughman
Petitioner: Ricky Van Tran
Respondent: David Baughman
Case Number: 2:2017cv01925
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/14/2020 ADOPTING in full 19 Findings and Recommendations. Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. The court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/6/20 ADOPTING 29 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 26 Motion to Stay. (Kaminski, H)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/31/20 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's motion for stay 26 be denied. Motion to Stay 26 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/30/20 DENYING 22 Motion to Amend and DENYING 23 Motion for stay and abeyance to its renewal within 30 days from the date of this order. The findings and recommendations 19 are held in abeyance for 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/11/2020 RECOMMENDING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/22/2017 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Van Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?