Ford v. Pierce
Plaintiff: Darren Vincent Ford
Defendant: C. Pierce
Case Number: 2:2017cv01928
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/2019 ORDERING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/2019 ADOPTING in FULL 46 Findings and Recommendations; REVOKING 12 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING 42 Motion to Proceed IFP; and Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall pay the appropriate filing fee prior to proceeding further with this action. Failure do so within the time period allotted will result in a dismissal of this action. (Washington, S)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/14/19 DENYING 42 Motion to Proceed IFP and DENYING 44 Motion for new jurisdiction. (Plummer, M)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/26/2018 VACATING in PART 41 Order, given the filing of plaintiff's 42 responsive pleading, with respect to its revocation of plaintiff's IFP status and direction that plaintiff pay the filing fee; ORDERING all other parts of 41 Order remain in effect; REINSTATING plaintiff's IFP status; DIRECTING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a District Court judge to this matter; and RECOMMENDING Pla intiff be formally declared a three-strikes litigant within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), Plaintiff's IFP status granted 1/11/2018 be revoked in light of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and Plaintiff be ordered to pay the appropriate filing fee prior to proceeding further with this action. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/10/18 DENYING 36 Motions to Compel Production and Appoint Counsel as premature; REVOKING plaintiff's in forma pauperis status; and DIRECTING plaintiff to submit filing fee within 21 days of the date of this order. (cc CDC Prisoner Payment Orders and Financial Department ) (Coll, A)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/30/18 DENYING 35 Motion for defendant to file a response and DENYING 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/26/18 DENYING 20 Motion for a mandatory settlement conference 25 Request for a settlement conference hearing 30 Motion for Discovery and 34 Request for defendant to file a respons e as premature and DENYING 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel 22 Request for Appointment of Counsel 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel as well as any and all summary judgment, jury trial, discovery, and motion to compel pleadings found in each of these enumerated pleadings. (Coll, A)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/6/2018 ORDERING that within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE regarding why he should not be declared a three-strikes litigant. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/10/2018 DENYING 16 Motion to Disqualify. (Henshaw, R)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Darren Vincent Ford signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/10/2018. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/29/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of request to proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $400. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Vincent Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?