Francis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Denise Francis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01993
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/3/2019 STRIKING 21 Order per plaintiff's notice of errata, and (2) fees and expenses in the amount of $3,950.00 Under The Equal Access To Justice Act. (Washington, S)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/1/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $3,590.00 as authorized by 28:2412, and no costs authorized by 28:1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (Reader, L)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/2/19 GRANTING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment ; DENYING 17 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and REMANDING this matter to the Commissioner for further consideration consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/18/18, ORDERING that the Order To Show Cause 13 is hereby DISCHARGED in its entirety. Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's 15 motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed within 30 days of service of plaintiff's motion. (Kastilahn, A)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/4/2018; Plaintiff to submit filing within 14 days. (Fabillaran, J)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/28/2018 GRANTING Plaintiff an extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has until April 2, 2018 to file MSJ. All other deadlines set forth in 5 Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. (Fabillaran, J)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/27/2017 ORDERING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; the Clerk of th e Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal; within 14 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM; USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Denise Francis
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?