Bumagat et al v. Shillinger et al
Plaintiff: Maynard Edralin Bumagat, Lorna Monsalud and S D S.
Defendant: Terry Shillinger, Amy Furlong, Andrew Bidou, Jeff Basset, Henry Soliman, County of Solano and City of Vallejo
Case Number: 2:2017cv02008
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ADOPTING 91 Findings and Recommendations in full signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/02/19 DISMISSING case with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/07/19 RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b) and closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/19 VACATING the 10/24/19 hearing on the 86 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; plaintiff shall file written opposition to Defendant's 86 Motion, or a statement of non-oppositio n thereto, by 4:00 P.M. 10/31/19. Plaintiff's failure to do so will be deemed a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion. Further, the Court will consider sanctioning Plaintiff for failing to follow the Court's orders, includin g a recommendation that Plaintiff's entire case be involuntarily dismissed with prejudice. Defendant may file a written reply to Plaintiff's opposition, if any, by 11/07/19. The matter will be taken under submission after all briefing has been submitted. Should the Court require a hearing on this matter, one will be scheduled at a later date. (Benson, A.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/19/19 DENYING 74 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Parties are to meet and confer regarding the mandatory disclosures and the preparation of the status report (due 7 days prior to th e 08/22/19 initial scheduling conference); within 10 days, Plaintiff shall file a report with the Court describing the status of the service of process on Defendant Soliman; and within 7 days, the parties shall submit their notices as to whether they elect to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction for all purposes. (Benson, A.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/19 ADOPTING 65 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 46 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against defendants Amy Furlong, Krishna A. Abrams, Adam C. Wright, the unidentified Child Protective Services supervisor, and the County of Solano are DISMISSED without leave to amend. (Coll, A)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/27/2019 RECOMMENDING that County Defendants' 46 motions to dismiss be granted. All claims against defendants Amy Furlong, Krishna A. Abrams, Adam C. Wrigh t, the unidentified Child Protective Services supervisor, and the County of Solano be dismissed without leave to amend. IT IS ALSO HEREBY ORDERED that City Defendants 55 motion to dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiff SHALL PAY the Clerk of Court $100 .00 in monetary sanctions based on his failure to comply with an 58 order of the court. Due to his in forma pauperis status, plaintiff shall pay the sanctions in increments of $20, with payments to be received by the Clerk of Court no later t han the following dates: 4/29/2019; 5/27/2019; 6/24/2019; 7/29/2019; and 8/26/2019. Plaintiff, through the U.S. Marshal, shall serve the Fourth Amended Complaint on defendant Henry Soliman. The Clerk shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summo ns, this court's scheduling order, and the forms providing notice of the magistrate judges availability to exercise jurisdiction for all purposes. Plaintiff shall supply the U.S. Marshal, within 30 days from the date this order is filed, with all information needed by the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service of process, and shall, within 10 days thereafter, file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal. Motion referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/29/2018 ORDERING no further briefing will be entertained with respect to 46 Motion to Dismiss. An order on the motion will issue in due course. The court DENIES 52 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Any opposition to 55 Motion to Dismiss shall be filed no later than 12/17/2018. Any reply brief is due 1/7/2019. (Zignago, K.)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/28/18 ORDERING that the Magistrate Judge is recused from further actions on this matter; and the Clerk shall reassign this case to another magistrate judge. (Becknal, R)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/27/18 DECLINING, to adopt the findings and recommendations (ECF No. 50 ) and REFERRING this matter back to the magistrate judge for a determination on the merits of the motion to dismiss and if necessary the motion to amend filed after the findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/29/18 RECOMMENDING that all claims against defendants Amy Furlong, Krishna A. Abrams and the County of Solano in Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Compliant should be dismissed without leave to amend. F&R referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due Within twenty days. (Kaminski, H)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/10/2018 ORDERING Case No. 2:17-CV-2022 TLN GGH PS is DISMISSED by plaintiff, and the Clerk shall close case number 2:17-CV-2022; the City defendants will file a new answer, including modified a ffirmative defenses, to 26 , the 4th Amended Complaint, within 14 days of the date of this order; Plaintiff's 37 Motion to file a document under seal, is DENIED; County defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss for failure to serve is GRANTED w ith leave to effect service, and plaintiff (though the Marshal) is ORDERED to serve the 4th Amended Complaint on the County defendants; County of Solano, Amy Furlong and Krishan Abrams; the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S.Marshal, Sacramento, CA; this Order resolves ECF Nos. 11, 22, 23, 24, 25 and 27. (Reader, L)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/1/2018 DISCHARGING 31 Order to Show Cause; GRANTING permission for plaintiff to file electronically; and SETTING a Motion Hearing re 15 Motion to Dismiss and 22 Motion to Strike Defenses for 4/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Opposition to 22 Motion to Strike due no later than 14 days prior to the scheduled hearing. No further motions shall be filed by any party prior to the scheduled hearing. (Fabillaran, J)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/22/2018 DIRECTING Plaintiff to respond to this Order to Show Cause within 30 days of the issuance of this Order. His response shall both explain why he did not attend the hearing and how he intends to alter his attention to the court's order to avoid further delay and fruitless imposition upon both the court and the defendants and their counsel. (York, M)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/27/2017 CONTINUING the 1/4/2018 Motion Hearing to 1/18/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Plaintiff shall file a declaration explaining why no opposition was timely filed, and shall file an opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to the motion, no later than January 4, 2018. (Hunt, G)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/21/17, ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-cv-02022-KJM-AC, is hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-cv-02022-TLN-GGH. (Kastilahn, A)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/9/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff Maynard Edralin Bumagat's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED 2 . Plaintiff is directed to eliminate now identified plaintiff Lorna Monsalud from all further filings unless Ms. Monsalud seeks pro se status or is represented by counsel' Plaintiff is directed to eliminate now identified plaintiff S.D.S., a minor, from all further filings unless a qualified representative is named f or him; Service on the named defendants is appropriate; The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within ninety days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, inclu ding a copy of this court's status order, without prepayment of costs; and the current Order; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal, 501 "I" Street, Sacramento, CA 95814, Tel. No. (916) 930-2030. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumagat et al v. Shillinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maynard Edralin Bumagat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Monsalud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S D S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Shillinger
Represented By: Kelly J. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Furlong
Represented By: Raymond Bangle, III
Represented By: Nicholas R. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bidou
Represented By: Kelly J. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Basset
Represented By: Kelly J. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Soliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Solano
Represented By: Raymond Bangle, III
Represented By: Nicholas R. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Kelly J. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?