Bouie v. Fox

Petitioner: Dirk Ja'ong Bouie
Respondent: Robert Fox
Case Number: 2:2017cv02044
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/2018 RECOMMENDING respondent's 11 motion to dismiss this action be granted; petitioner's 19 motion to stay and abey this action under Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269 (2005), be denied; and the instant 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed because untimely filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1)(D). Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/27/2018 GRANTING in part 29 Request for Extended Time. Petitioner to file and serve, on or before 8/15/2018, a reply to 26 Response to 19 Motion for Stay and Abeyance, and a surreply to 27 Reply in support of 11 Motion to Dismiss. (Henshaw, R)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/20/18 ORDERING within 14 days after the filing date of this order, counsel for respondent is hereby ordered to file (or lodge in paper) a copy of the California Supreme Court's order date 1/11/17 denying petitioner habeas relief. (Plummer, M)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/2/2018 VACATING the 18 findings and recommendations filed 4/27/2018. Petitioner shall, within 21 days, file and serve an opposition to the pending motion to dismiss; no further extensions of time will be granted. Petitioner shall, within 14 days, serve on respondent a copy of petitioner's 19 motion to stay and abey this action. Respondent shall, within 45 days, file and serve a reply to petitioner's opposition, if any, to respon dent's motion to dismiss, and a response to petitioner's motion to stay and abey this action. The Clerk shall (a) Designate on the docket that ECF No. 20 is a "letter of clarification" (not an opposition); and (b) Send petitioner, together with this order, a copy of his motion to stay and abey this action so that petitioner may serve the motion on respondent. (Yin, K)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/26/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice under Rule 41(b), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/5/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit an IFP Application or the appropriate filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Clerk to send new IFP form.(Hunt, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouie v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dirk Ja'ong Bouie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?