Nutrition Distribution, LLC v. Enhanced Athlete, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nutrition Distribution, LLC
Defendant: Enhanced Athlete, Inc., Gilmore Engineering, Inc., Scott E. Cavell and Charles Anthony Hughes
Case Number: 2:2017cv02069
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/18 DENYING Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Sanctions. (Becknal, R)
May 14, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2018 GRANTING Substitution of Attorney Richard N. Grey for Defendants Enhanced Athlete and Scott Cavell. Attorneys Michael Adams, Damon Mircheff and Brian Berggren are TERMINATED. (Hunt, G) Modified on 5/14/2018 (Krueger, M).
January 12, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/11/18 ORDERING that Nutrition Distribution's Complaint and the summons in this action ARE DEEMED SERVED on Cavell, in his individual capacity, on 01/08/18, and that Cavell shall have 21 days therefrom to respond to the Complaint (i.e., up to and including 01/29/18). (Benson, A.)
January 2, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/2018 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-cv-02069-JAM-CKD, is hereby reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-cv-02069-TLN-KJN. (Becknal, R)
November 14, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/17, DENYING plaintiff's 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrition Distribution, LLC v. Enhanced Athlete, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrition Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Robert Tauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Athlete, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Adams
Represented By: Damon Mircheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmore Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: D. Keith Byron Dunnagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Cavell
Represented By: Michael D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Anthony Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?