Confi-Chek, Inc. v. Rahman et al

Plaintiff: Confi-Chek, Inc.
Defendant: Ashfaq Rahman and Localblox, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02135
Filed: October 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/3/19 ORDERING that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice; each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/31/18. The parties are agreeable to the Court's maintaining jurisdiction over this action until 12/14/18, or such other time as the Court deems appropriate, so that the Court can take any necessary measures to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement, and its amendment, if Defendants fail to honor their obligations thereunder. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/2018 EXTENDING time through 2/16/2018, for Plaintiff to file a responsive pleading to 8 Counterclaim. (York, M)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/3/17: Both Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than December 6, 2017. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Confi-Chek, Inc. v. Rahman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confi-Chek, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Heath Escovedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashfaq Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Localblox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?