Brooks v. Spearman et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Lyn Brooks
Defendant: M. E. Spearman, C Romero, Y. Vang and F. Rodreguez
Case Number: 2:2017cv02172
Filed: October 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUSE AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/13/2019 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Dennis Lyn Brooks via tele-conferencing at 9:00 a.m. on 3/6/2019 before the Honorable Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on Custodian. (Henshaw, R)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 39 , 45 , 46 motions for appointment of counsel. On or before 8/1/2018, plaintiff shall inform the court whether he intends to appear at the 9/11/2018 settlement conference in person or by phone. (Yin, K)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/2018. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assig ned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker)(Yin, K)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/19/2018 ADOPTING 18 Findings and Recommendations in Full. The claims against defendants Spearman, Crawford, Needles, Powell, Courtney and Ramirez are DISMISSED. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/21/2018 The court construes 26 Objections as a request for reconsideration and is AFFIRMING the 17 Order of the magistrate judge.(Washington, S)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/2018 DENYING 19 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and DENYING 21 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/17 RECOMMENDING that the claims against defendants Spearman, Crawford, Needles, Powell, Courtney and Ramirez be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dennis Lyn Brooks. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/31/17 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff with another copy of the in forma pauperis application used by this court. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a fully completed in forma pauperis application. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Spearman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lyn Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Vang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Rodreguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?