Mills v. Davis
Petitioner: Jeffery Jon Mills
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 2:2017cv02195
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/14/19 ORDERING within 45 days of the filed date of this order, petitioner shall file any motion to stay and abey these proceedings pending exhaustion of the issues identified in the parties June 13 joint statement. Within 30 days of the filing of that motion, respondent shall file a response. Within 15 days of the filing of a response, petitioner may file a reply. The motion need not be set for oral argument. If the court finds argument necessary, it will schedule a hearing. (Plummer, M)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/10/19 ORDERING that the corrected amended petition 35 -1 shall be filed in this action in place of the amended petition filed April 12, 2019 32 . Further, the corrected amended petition is deemed to have been timely filed. (Plummer, M)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/30/19 ORDERING that within forty-five days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint statement addressing the issues described above, as well as any other issues the parties find important at this point in the proceedings. (Plummer, M)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/16/19 ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full GRANTING IN PART 26 Motion to Amend the Complaint; Petitioner is entitled to equitable tolling of the statute of limitations for the time period of the partial and temporary government shutdowns, amounting to 56 days; Respondent shall not file an answer until after the statute of limitations, considering the periods of equitable tolling, has expired. (Benson, A.)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/15/2019 RECOMMENDING petitioner's 26 motion to amend be granted in part; the court find petitioner is entitled to equitable tolling of the statute of limitations f or the time period of the partial and temporary government shutdowns, amounting to 56 days; and respondent be instructed that he shall not file an answer until after the statute of limitations, considering the periods of equitable tolling, have expired. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/27/18 ORDERING on or before September 13, 2018, petitioner shall file the petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Based on the size of the record in this case, the court finds good cause for respondent's request to lodge the state court record within 90 days. By May 24, 2018, respondent shall file a Notice of Lodging and lodge with the court the state court record. (See order for further details.)(Plummer, M)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/9/2018 APPOINTING Deborah Czuba as counsel for Petitioner Jeffery John Mills. Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Selection Board Letter under SEAL. (cc Kurt Heiser) (Donati, J)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/06/17 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner's application for appointment of counsel 1 is granted. This case is referred to the Eastern District Selection Board for a recommenda tion of qualified counsel. There being no scheduled execution date pending, petitioners request for a stay of execution 1 is denied without prejudice to renewal should any proceedings related to the execution of his sentence of death, including pr eparation for execution and the setting of an execution date, be instituted in state court during the pendency of the instant proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Office of the Federal Defender, Eastern District Selection Board, 801 I St., Sacramento, CA 95814. (cc: Federal Defender, Habeas Appointment). (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffery Jon Mills
Represented By: Kelly L. Culshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Norman Sokoler(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?