Garcia v. San Joaquin County Courthouse
Petitioner: Arturo C. Garcia
Respondent: San Joaquin County Courthouse
Case Number: 2:2017cv02279
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/18/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/23/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case is assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison; the new case number is 2:17-cv-2279 JAM CMK (HC).(Yin, K)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/13/18 GRANTING 5 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Petitioner shall file an amended petition on the form emp loyed by this court, and which names the proper respondent and states all claims and requests for relief within 30 days of the date of this order. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner the court's form habeas corpus application. (Plummer, M)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/30/17 ORDERING petitioner shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court,within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Plummer, M) Modified on 11/30/2017 (Plummer, M).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. San Joaquin County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo C. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: San Joaquin County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?