Bradley v. County of San Joaquin et al
Plaintiff: Denise L. Bradley
Defendant: County of San Joaquin, San Joaquin Sheriff's Department, Steve Moore and Michael Knight
Case Number: 2:2017cv02313
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED JOINT ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/28/18 on the handling of electronically stored information. (Benson, A.)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2018 APPROVING and INCORPORATING the parties' 61 Stipulated Protective Order. (Becknal, R)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/20/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 46 and 47 Motions to Compel. Associated documents must be produced within 10 days following entry of a stipulated protective order per District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller's 57 Order. (Zignago, K.)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/23/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 31 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs must file any amended complaint within 14 days. (York, M)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/13/2018 DENYING 40 Motion to Compel without prejudice; The hearing set for the motion is VACATED. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. (Washington, S)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/4/2018 ORDERING that the Corrected Second Amended Complaint shall be filed and thetime for Defendants to file a response (which may be a motion) is 14 days from4/23/2018. (Hunt, G)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/26/2018 GRANTING the parties' 26 Stipulation; the Corrected Second Amended Complaint shall be filed and the time for Defendants to file a response is 14 days from 4/23/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be due on or before 3/14/2018. (Washington, S)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/17/2018 ORDERING that the parties shall conduct pretrial matters, other than discovery motions, before the District Judge assigned to this action. This matter is REFERRED back to the District Judge assigned to this action. (Hunt, G)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/2/2018 ORDERING the Defendant's time to answer 1 COMPLAINT is EXTENDED to 2/1/2018. (Washington, S)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING service is appropriate for defendants County of San Joaquin, San Joaquin Sheriff's Department, Steve Moore and Michael Knight. The clerk shall send plaintiff the necessary paperwork to effect service of process. Within 15 days the plaintiff is DIRECTED to supply the USM with the necessary documentation. The USM is DIRECTED to complete service within 90 Days.(Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. County of San Joaquin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise L. Bradley
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Joaquin
Represented By: Dana A. Suntag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Dana A. Suntag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Moore
Represented By: Dana A. Suntag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Knight
Represented By: Dana A. Suntag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?