Johnson v. Hopkins

Plaintiff: R. Wayne Johnson
Defendant: Cedric Hopkins
Case Number: 2:2017cv02351
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2018 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
February 7, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/7/2018 VACATING 4 Findings and Recommendations; Plaintiff shall file the further briefing described above within 30 days. (Fabillaran, J)
December 29, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/2017 ORDERING Clerk of Court to assign a district judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
November 20, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/20/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?