Burton v. Mohyuddia
Plaintiff: Kendall Burton
Defendant: Mohyuddia
Case Number: 2:2017cv02405
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/23/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Kendall Burton on 7/16/19 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custo dian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/9/2019 ORDERING this case is set for a Settlement Conference on 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Within 10 days, plaintiff shall return the attached form notifying the court whether he would like to attend the settlement conference in person or by video. The parties shall exchange non-confidential settlement statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference in accordance with this order. The dispositive motions deadline is continued to 9/13/2019. 22 Motion for pretrial/settlement conference terminated as moot. (cc: ADR; KJN) (Yin, K)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/30/2019 DENYING 20 Request for Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/30/2018 ADOPTING in FULL 12 Findings and Recommendations; Plaintiff's claims against defendants Malakkla and Lewis are DISMISSED without prejudice; and This case shall proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claims. (Washington, S)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/1/2018 ADOPTING the 8 Findings and Recommendations in full; and plaintiff's 7 motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Yin, K)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/22/2018 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's claims against defendants Malakkla and Lewis be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/17/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kendall Burton. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Mohyuddia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohyuddia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?