Stewart v. Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Plaintiff: Colleen Stewart
Defendant: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 2:2017cv02418
Filed: November 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/16/2020 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall cease contacting the court to submit any documents regarding her case. The motions are now under submission, and the parties will be contacted if any more information is required. The parties will be informed of the court's findings and recommendations after reviewing all information currently received. Failure to follow this order will result in sanctions, which may include monetary sanctions including possibly dismissal of plaintiff's case. (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/5/2020 GRANTING plaintiff until 10/16/2020 to respond to 73 Objections. (Coll, A)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/13/2020 Plaintiff shall file opposition to the motion for summary judgment, or a statement of non-opposition on or before 9/17/2020. Defendant may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition on or before 9/24/2020. Thereafter, the court will take this matter under submission without a hearing. (Kastilahn, A)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/4/2020 VACATING the 8/13/2020 hearing on defendant's 61 motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall file opposition to the motion for summary judgment, or a statement of non-opposition on or before 8/27/2020. Defendant may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition on or before 9/3/2020. Thereafter, the court will take this matter under submission without a hearing. (Kastilahn, A)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER 50 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on July 17, 2019 ORDERING the Deposition of Colleen Stewart currently scheduled for July 18, 2019 to take place on August 22, 2019 in Sacramento. If Plaintiff fails to attend her deposition as agreed to and ordered on August 22, 2019, Defendant may move the Court for appropriate relief and/or sanctions, and such motion will not be subject to the current discovery motion cut off. (Krueger, M)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 05/10/19 GRANTING 43 Motion to Continue as follows: Plaintiff's Deposition: to be scheduled by the parties; Discovery Cut-Off: 07/15/19; Settlement Conference: to be rescheduled per 44 Order; Expert Witness Deadline: 08/12/19; Supplemental Expert Deadline: 09/03/19; Dispositive Motion Deadline: 10/11/19. (Benson, A.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/19 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 5/1/19 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Coll, A)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/2019; parties have agreed, with the exception of plaintiffs bank statements, credit card statements, and phone records referenced below, that plaintiff has presently produced all documents in her possession, custody, or control in response to defendant's requests for production of documents. The parties further agree that, no later than 1/29/2019, plaintiff shall produce either: (a) all her bank statements, credit card statement s, and phone records responsive to Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two, Nos. 15-17, or (b) the account numbers corresponding to such documents along with a signed authorization from plaintiff for release of such documents sufficient for defendant to expeditiously subpoena such documents from appropriate third parties. The settlement conference presently set for 2/12/2019 shall go forward. Defendant's request for sanctions is DENIED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/09/19 CONTINUING the following dates: Discovery Cut-Off: 06/07/19; Expert Witness deadline: 07/12/19 with any supplemental experts due 08/02/19; Dispositive Motion deadline: 09/19/19. The 02/12/19 Settlement Conference REMAINS on calendar. (Benson, A.)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/30/18 GRANTING 20 Motion to Compel as outlined in Order. Plaintiff's continued deposition shall take place on 01/15/19; no later than 12/21/18, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall file a b rief joint status report with the court indicating that all written discovery ordered above has been produced and confirming the date of plaintiff's deposition; defendant's Request for Sanctions is DENIED without prejudice. (Benson, A.)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/14/18 CONTINUING the Fact Discovery cutoff to 2/8/2019; Expert Designation deadline to 3/8/2019; Supplemental Expert Designation deadline to 3/29/2019; and the deadline for hearing Dispositive Motions 5/16/19. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/18 ORDERING that within seven days of this order, the parties shall indicate whether they are amenable to having the settlement conference conducted before the undersigned.(Kastilahn, A)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/24/18 EXTENDING Discovery deadline to 12/10/2018; Expert Designation to 1/7/2019 and supplemental expert designation to 1/28/2019. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER re bifurcation of trial of Brandt fee issue signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/2018. (Zignago, K.)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE THE FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/10/18. The Fact Discovery cutoff is CONTINUED from 10/1/18 to 11/9/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Stewart
Represented By: James Harold Vorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Ann Kathryn Johnston
Represented By: Ted A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?