William H. Baymiller v. People of the State of California
Petitioner: William Holt Baymiller
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2017cv02458
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tehama
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/24/18 ORDERING that The FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 6/29/18 16 are ADOPTED in full; Petitioner's Motion to Stay 13 is GRANTED. This action is ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED; and Petitioner is ORDERED to inform the court within thirty days of the exhaustion in state court of the unexhausted claim raised in the original petition. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/29/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to appoint a district judge to this action and RECOMMENDING 13 Motion to Stay be granted; this action be administratively staye d; and Petitioner be ordered to inform the court within 30 days of the exhaustion in state court of the unexhausted claim raised in the original petition. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/7/2018 GRANTING 8 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner shall inform the court whether he wishes to proceed with his exhausted claims, or whether he wishes to stay this action pending exhaustion of unexhausted claims within 30 days of the date of this order. (Fabillaran, J)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William H. Baymiller v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Holt Baymiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?