Degraw v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Makenzy Degraw
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Commerical Casualty Company and Progressive Casualty
Case Number: 2:2017cv02537
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/2/18 GRANTING 23 Motion to Dismiss: Each party shall bear her/its own costs and attorneys' fees. This action shall be dismissed in its entirety. (Kaminski, H)
March 22, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/18, ORDERING that this action, including formal discovery, is temporarily STAYED pending an early mediation contemplated to take place sometime in May 2018. The March 29, 2018 status conference is VACATED. All named defendants, other than defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, are DISMISSED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 19, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Troy L. Nunley on 01/19/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to the Consents of the parties, the above-captioned case is REASSIGNED and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings and entry of final judgment. Any hearing dates currently set before the undersigned are VACATED. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:17-cv-2537 KJN. (Benson, A.)
January 5, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/2018 DIRECTING Plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint with the Court within 7 days of this order. (York, M)
January 2, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/18 EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Defendants shall have until 1/5/2018 to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Degraw v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makenzy Degraw
Represented By: Erika Ramona Sembrano
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany Tran
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Commerical Casualty Company
Represented By: Tiffany Tran
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?