United States of America v. Approximately $8,000.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $8,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2017cv02538
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT and FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/10/18. The FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 14 are ADOPTED. Jalen Angel and E. Diaza are held in default. A judgment by default is hereby entered against any right, title, or interests of Jalen Angel and E. Diaza in the defendant currency referenced in the above caption. A final judgment of forfeiture is hereby entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defendant currency to the United States, to be disposed of according to law. All parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 17, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/17/2018 RECOMMENDING that: Jalen Angel and E. Diaza be held in default; the United States motion for default judgment and final judgment of forfeiture be granted; That judgme nt by default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Jalen Angel and E. Diaza in the defendant currency referenced in the above caption; That a final judgment be entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in t he defendant currency to the United States, to be disposed of according to law; That the Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture lodged herein be signed by the Honorable Troy L. Nunley and filed by the Clerk of the Court. Objections due within 14 days after these findings and recommendations are filed. (Hunt, G)
January 19, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/18/2018 GRANTING 8 Request to Extend the Deadline, through 5/4/2018, to file a Joint Status Report. (York, M)
December 11, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/11/2017. (Washington, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $8,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $8,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?