Taum v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Thomas Jerome Taum, IV
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv02542
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yuba
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for AWARD of EAJA FEES and COSTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/5/2018. (York, M)
August 30, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/29/18 REMANDING CASE to Commissioner of Social Security. (Kaminski, H)
August 2, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/1/2018 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days to file her MSJ. The new due date for Defendant's MSJ is 8/29/2018. (Zignago, K.)
April 30, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/30/18: Plaintiff is granted an extension of thirty days, through Wednesday, May 30, 2018, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taum v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jerome Taum, IV
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?